+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1078 is now Act 64
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
- TO BE ENROLLED
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as Passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
- Received from the House.
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
- RULES SUSPENDED
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
On January 2, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
February 4, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Absent: 2
January 31, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 95
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Joint Budget Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor