+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1074 is now Act 58
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
- TO BE ENROLLED
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately returned to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Received from the House.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On December 28, 2018 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by J. Mayberry
+ − Votes (2)
January 31, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
January 28, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 6