+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Notification that HB1073 is now Act 59
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on City, County, and Local Affairs
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Boyd
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Boyd
+ − Votes (2)
February 9, 2015: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34