+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Notification that HB1072 is now Act 161
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as Passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
- RULES SUSPENDED
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
February 19, 2014: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
February 18, 2014: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Joint Budget Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor