+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 17, 2020 in the House:
- Notification that HB1070 is now Act 65
On April 16, 2020 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
- TO BE ENROLLED
On April 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
- Received from the House.
On April 15, 2020 in the House:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
- RULES SUSPENDED
On April 8, 2020 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
On April 2, 2020 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
April 16, 2020: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
April 15, 2020: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 98
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Joint Budget Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor