+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Notification that HB1063 is now Act 25
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
February 4, 2015: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 1
January 26, 2015: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor