+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 4 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On December 20, 2018 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment H4
Sponsored by Pilkington
Amendment H3
Sponsored by Pilkington
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Pilkington
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Pilkington