+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Notification that HB1056 is now Act 637
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education
- Received from the House.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On December 27, 2016 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by House
+ − Votes (2)
March 20, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
March 1, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 24
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor