+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Notification that HB1054 is now Act 451
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology, and Legislative Affairs
- Received from the House.
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Re-referred to reassign to transfer to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
On December 21, 2016 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H2
Sponsored by V. Flowers
Amendment H1
Sponsored by V. Flowers
+ − Votes (2)
March 6, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
February 21, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor