+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do not pass.
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On January 10, 2011 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on House Committee on Judiciary
On December 7, 2010 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H1
Sponsored by D. Altes
Amendment H2
Sponsored by D. Altes
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor