+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Notification that HB1050 is now Act 1165
On April 1, 2011 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
- TO BE ENROLLED
On March 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Returned to the House as passed.
On March 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Re-referred to the Committee on ENERGY - JOINT
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On January 10, 2011 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on Joint Committee on Energy
On December 7, 2010 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H1
Sponsored by D. Altes
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Westerman
+ − Votes (2)
March 31, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
March 30, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 88
- Present/NV: 11