+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Sine Die adjournment
- Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology and Legislative Affairs
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- The vote by which HB1049 Having Failed to Pass. was expunged.
- Read the third time and failed.
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology and Legislative Affairs
- Received from the House.
On February 1, 2011 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Motion to Reconsider HB1049 passed.
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Read the third time and failed.
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On January 10, 2011 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on House Committee on Public Transportation
On December 7, 2010 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Allen
Amendment S1
Sponsored by L. Chesterfield
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Allen
+ − Votes (3)
February 16, 2011: Read the third time and failed.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 13
February 1, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 41
- Present/NV: 4
January 31, 2011: Read the third time and failed.
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 47
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor