+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Notification that HB1049 is now Act 283
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
- Received from the House.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
On December 17, 2020 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Jett
+ − Votes (2)
March 4, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
February 22, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 97
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor