+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Notification that HB1048 is now Act 319
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor
- Received from the House.
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 3
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
On December 13, 2016 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment H3
Sponsored by D. Meeks
Amendment H2
Sponsored by D. Meeks
Amendment H1
Sponsored by D. Meeks
+ − Votes (2)
March 2, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 1
February 24, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 89
- Present/NV: 11