+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Notification that HB1047 is now Act 633
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Senate amendment # 2 read and concurred in.
- TO BE ENROLLED
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 & 2
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 & 2
- Re-referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and failed.
- The vote by which HB 1047 FAILED of adoption was EXPUNGED.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
- Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to suspend rule of fiscal impact passed.
- Motion for immediate consideraton passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
On December 13, 2016 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
March 20, 2017: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 12
March 20, 2017: Senate amendment # 2 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 15
March 8, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 2
March 6, 2017: Read the third time and failed.
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 6
January 31, 2017: Motion to suspend rule of fiscal impact passed.
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 7
January 31, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor