+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sine Die adjournment
- Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor
- Received from the House.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 3
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On December 7, 2016 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Bentley
Amendment H3
Sponsored by Bentley
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Bentley
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Bentley
+ − Vote
January 30, 2017: CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 39
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsors (48)
Type:
Primary Sponsor