+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On October 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation
- Received from the House.
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
On December 17, 2020 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Vote
January 27, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 97
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor