+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
- Sine Die adjournment
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education
On March 25, 2011 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 2 and 3. read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 1, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On January 10, 2011 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on House Committee on Education
On December 1, 2010 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment H3
Sponsored by D. Altes
Amendment H1
Sponsored by D. Altes
Amendment H2
Sponsored by D. Altes
+ − Vote
March 25, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor