+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Notification that HB1032 is now Act 45
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On December 5, 2016 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H2
Sponsored by A. Mayberry
Amendment H1
Sponsored by A. Mayberry
+ − Votes (2)
January 26, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
January 23, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 12
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor