+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
- Notification that HB1026 is now Act 125
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
- TO BE ENROLLED
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Returned to the House as passed.
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
On December 15, 2020 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
February 9, 2021: Returned to the House as passed.
- Yeas: 35
January 27, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 4