+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Notification that HB1025 is now Act 570
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry and Economic Development
- Received from the House.
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- The vote by which HB1025 Failed to Pass was expunged.
- EXPUNGED
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Read the third time and failed.
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On January 15, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by McElroy
+ − Votes (4)
March 28, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 2
March 11, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 19
January 30, 2013: The vote by which HB1025 Failed to Pass was expunged.
- Yeas: 95
- Present/NV: 5
January 28, 2013: Read the third time and failed.
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 69
- Present/NV: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor