+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Notification that HB1023 is now Act 27
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on City, County and Local Affairs
- Received from the House.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On January 10, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Mayberry
+ − Votes (2)
January 30, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
January 28, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 97
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor