+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Notification that HB1022 is now Act 26
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology and Legislative Affairs
- Received from the House.
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
On January 10, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
January 29, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
January 24, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 7