+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On October 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
- Re-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Received from the House.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On December 4, 2020 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment S2
Sponsored by B. Davis
Amendment S1
Sponsored by B. Davis
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Cloud
+ − Vote
February 24, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 89
- Present/NV: 11