+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Notification that HB1019 is now Act 195
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as Passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- RULES SUSPENDED
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Joint Budget Committee
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Joint Budget Committee
+ − Votes (2)
April 28, 2016: Read the third time and passed.
+ − Sponsor
Joint Budget Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor