+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 20, 2020 in the House:
- Notification that HB1016 is now Act 89
On April 16, 2020 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
- TO BE ENROLLED
On April 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
- Received from the House.
On April 15, 2020 in the House:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On April 9, 2020 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On April 8, 2020 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
On April 2, 2020 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Joint Budget Committee
+ − Votes (2)
April 16, 2020: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 15, 2020: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Joint Budget Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor