+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- Notification that HB1015 is now Act 812
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
- Received from the House.
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 10, 2011 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on House Committee on Judiciary
On November 23, 2010 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (2)
March 28, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
February 16, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 4