+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1012 is now Act 167
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE
- Received from the House.
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
On December 3, 2018 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by D. Wallace
+ − Votes (3)
February 14, 2019: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 90
- Present/NV: 10
February 13, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
January 31, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 98
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor