+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Notification that HB1007 is now Act 430
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
- TO BE ENROLLED
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Returned to the House as Passed.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 3
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On November 17, 2016 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
March 2, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 1
February 16, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 89
- Present/NV: 11
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor