+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1006 is now Act 166
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Returned to the House as passed.
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
On November 26, 2018 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
February 14, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 2
February 5, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor