+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Notification that HB1004 is now Act 827
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
- Received from the House.
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on ENERGY - JOINT
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
On November 18, 2014 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H2
Sponsored by S. Meeks
Amendment H1
Sponsored by S. Meeks
+ − Votes (2)
March 24, 2015: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 6
March 19, 2015: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 83
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 16
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor