+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Health & Human Services Committee.
- First read in House.
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:29PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass.
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Votes (2)
March 3, 2020: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 13
February 5, 2020: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor