+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in House
- Transmit to House
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: GR (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Government Reform: Do pass amended
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Government Reform
- Judiciary: Withdrawn
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Senate second read
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (4)
Government Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 8, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 11
February 15, 2011: Government Reform: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor