+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 19, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On April 7, 2010 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On March 24, 2010 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in House
- House second read
On March 23, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- House first read
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 2:33 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On January 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Senate first read
+ − Amendment
2-5 approp
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (4)
March 23, 2010: Appropriations: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 3
March 23, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
March 8, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
January 26, 2010: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 9