+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- APPROP (ref Resolution) adopted
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
January 31, 2017: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor