+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass amended.
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
February 5, 2019: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2