+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Secretary of state
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- House first read
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Unanimously adopted
- Senate first read
+ − Votes (2)
March 23, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 4
March 18, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (55)
Type:
Primary Sponsor