+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Secretary of State.
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee: do pass.
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:25PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee: do pass.
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Votes (10)
April 4, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
April 4, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
March 3, 2016: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
March 3, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
March 3, 2016: House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 7
March 3, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 25, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 28
February 25, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
January 28, 2016: Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 6
January 28, 2016: Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6