+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held awaiting committee of whole
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Government: Do pass
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Senate first read
+ − Vote
January 28, 2015: Government: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor