+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Secretary of state
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
- Amendment withdrawn: Floor Amend to Con Res - Hale
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Energy, Environment and Natural Resources: Do pass
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Energy, Environment and Natural Resources
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:55 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
- Senate first read
+ − Amendment
2-10nrra
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 16, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 2
March 11, 2014: Energy, Environment and Natural Resources: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
March 11, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
March 6, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 3
February 3, 2014: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor