+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmitted version: Senate engrossed version
- Transmitted to: Secretary of state
- Transmit to Senate
On April 18, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
- Higher Education, Innovation and Reform: Do pass
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Higher Education, Innovation and Reform
- House first read
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: ED (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Education: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Economic Development and Jobs Creation: Withdrawn
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Education
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Economic Development and Jobs Creation
- Education: Withdrawn
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Education
On January 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (6)
Education
Senate Proposed Amendment
Education - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Education - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Education
Senate Proposed Amendment
2-10 ed_strikermemo
Senate Fact Sheet
2-17 ed_strikermemo_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 18, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
March 23, 2011: Higher Education, Innovation and Reform: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
March 23, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
March 8, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
February 9, 2011: Education: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor