+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Secretary of state
On June 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 26, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On June 25, 2009 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On June 23, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
- Government: Do pass
On June 22, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
- House first read
On June 19, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On June 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
- Amendment adopted: Harper flr amend (ref VMA)
- Amendment adopted: VMA (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On June 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On June 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On June 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Veterans and Military Affairs: Do pass amended/strike-everything
- Assigned to committee: Veterans and Military Affairs
- Senate second read
On January 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (6)
Harper Floor Amendment; reference to VMA amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Veterans and Military Affairs - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Veterans and Military Affairs - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
6-15 strikermemo caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
6-8 vma strikermemo
Senate Fact Sheet
Harper Floor Amendment; reference to VMA amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
June 26, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 11
June 22, 2009: Government: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
June 22, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
June 18, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 3
June 10, 2009: Veterans and Military Affairs: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor