+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Secretary of state
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Begay flr amend (ref Resolution)
- Amendment failed: Gallardo flr amend (ref Resolution)
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:45 pmobject
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Government and Environment: Do pass
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government and Environment
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (5)
Government and Environment
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government and Environment
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government and Environment
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government and Environment
Senate Proposed Amendment
Begay flr amend (ref Resolution) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 20, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
January 27, 2014: Government and Environment: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
January 27, 2014: Rules: Proper for consideration (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor