+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Secretary of state
On February 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 12:40 pm
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transportation: Do pass
On January 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
1-26 trans
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (2)
February 7, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
January 23, 2007: Transportation: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor