+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Secretary of state
On January 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On January 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 2:45 pmobject
On January 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty: Do pass
On January 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
1-18 bsfss
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (2)
January 27, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 3
January 18, 2011: Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor