+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Secretary of state
- Transmit to Senate
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Federalism and States' Rights: Do pass
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Federalism and States' Rights
- House first read
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: WE (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Water and Energy: Do pass amended
- Assigned to committee: Water and Energy
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (2)
Water and Energy
Senate Adopted Amendment
Water and Energy
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 18, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 3
February 18, 2015: Federalism and States' Rights: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
February 18, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 16, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 1
February 2, 2015: Water and Energy: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor