+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Secretary of State.
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee: do pass.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:15PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Water and Energy Committee: do pass.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Water and Energy Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Votes (10)
April 4, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 2
April 4, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 24
February 17, 2016: House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
February 17, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 17, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 17, 2016: Energy, Environment and Natural Resources: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
February 11, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 11
February 11, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
January 26, 2016: Water and Energy: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
January 26, 2016: Senate Water and Energy Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor