+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 16, 2008 in the House:
- Appropriations: Failed to pass
On April 14, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Homeland Security and Property Rights: Withdrawn
On March 31, 2008 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in House
- House second read
On March 27, 2008 in the House:
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Homeland Security and Property Rights
- House first read
On March 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:25 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass
On February 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
- Senate second read
On February 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendment
2-26pshs
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (3)
April 14, 2008: Appropriations: Failed to pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 3
March 13, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
February 12, 2008: Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3