+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 29, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmitted version: Senate engrossed version
- Transmitted to: Secretary of state
On April 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 28, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 27, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 22, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 16, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On March 15, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- House first read
- Ways and Means: Do pass
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 2:39 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass
On February 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Senate first read
+ − Amendment
2-15 fin
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 28, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 1
March 15, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
March 15, 2010: Ways and Means: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
March 1, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
February 1, 2010: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor