+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Secretary of State.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 5:34PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee: do pass.
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Griffin flr amend (ref Memorial) adopted
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 26, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 22
February 20, 2017: House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
February 20, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 2, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 13
January 17, 2017: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor